Our Governors
Welcome to our Governors’ section.
Role of the Governing Board
The role of a governor is to contribute to the work of the Governing Board in ensuring high standards of achievement for all children.The main responsibilities of a governor
- As part of a team:
- Setting the strategic direction of the school;
- Holding the leadership to account for the performance of the school;
- Making sure that resources are used well for the needs of the children.
The Governing Board is made up of:
- Co-opted Governors (appointed by the Directors)
- Parent Governors (elected by parents)
- Staff Governors (elected by staff)
Please find below details of how our Governing body is structured, including the names, positions, responsibilities and terms of appointment for each Governor.
The Governors can be contacted at any time via a sealed envelope and delivered to Ms Y Wakefield, Leigh Trust, 104 Naseby Road, Alum Rock, Birmingham, B8 3HG
Meet the Governors
Last updated 29th September 2023
Name |
Position |
Date of Appointment |
Term of Office |
Responsibility |
Appointment by |
Governance role in other educational institutions |
Business and Financial Interests |
Mrs Alison Williams | Head Teacher | 01/09/2022 | Nansen Primary School | ||||
Mrs Charlotte Nott | EHT | 01/09/2022 | Alston Primary School | ||||
Mrs Samara Azam |
DHT Associate Governor (non-voting) |
01/09/2019 |
|||||
Mr Alan Nevin |
Staff Governor |
18/03/2022 |
4 Years |
Staff |
|||
Mrs Kathryn Hindley |
Vice Chair |
08/02/2021 |
4 Years |
Pupil Premium & Year Group 5 & 6 |
Directors |
Birmingham City Mission Children's Team |
|
Caron Round | Co-opted Governor | 22/09/2022 | 4 years | LAC/SEND | Directors | Works at Wyndcliffe Primary School | |
Laura Hillman |
Co-opted Governor | 17/07/2023 | 4 years | Directors | TBC | Works at Yenton Primary School | |
Mr Zaheer Akbar |
Parent Governor |
31/11/2019 (re-elected 31/01/2023) |
4 Years |
Sports Premium & Year Group EYFS |
Parents |
Alum Rock community Forum & B8 Men's Group |
|
Mrs Halima Parveen |
Parent Governor |
07/10/2020 |
4 years |
Parents |
|||
Mrs Charlotte Taft |
Clerk to the governors |
01/09/2022 |
N/A |
Link to governor training |
N/A |
Attingham Education | |
RESIGNATIONS WITHIN LAST 12 MONTHS |
Date Resigned/End of Term |
||||||
Shazana Iqbal | Co-opted | 08/09/2022 | |||||
Rukhsana Kabal | Co-opted | 08/09/2022 | |||||
Hasnat Minhas | Co-opted | 07/02/2023 | |||||
Robert Cummins | Co-opted | 27/09/2023 |
Attendance Records
LEIGH LGB ATTENDANCE TO DATE
SEPTEMBER 2023– JULY 2024
NAME | ATTENDANCE |
Alison Williams - Head Teacher | |
Charlotte Nott - Executive Head Teacher | |
Alan Nevin - Staff | |
Kathryn Hindley - Co-opted | |
Caron Round - Co-opted | |
Laura Hillman - Co-opted | |
Zaheer Akbar - Parent | |
Halima Parveen - Parent |